FL H7067 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising initial scholarship eligibility criteria for the Family Empowerment Scholarship Program; requiring that priority be given to students whose household income levels do not exceed a specified amount or who are in foster care or out-of-home; requiring a scholarship-funding organization to refer students who did not receive a scholarship because of lack of funds to another scholarship-funding organization, etc.
Title
K-12 Scholarship Programs
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | House Education Committee | Rep. Jennifer Sullivan [R] | Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#580 (Y: 81 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#580 (Y: 81 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Chapter No. 2020-95 | |
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-13 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 21 NAYS 14 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Pending amendment(s), failed (159850) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Temporarily postponed 723 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) pending (159850) 723 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Temporarily postponed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1220 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 81 NAYS 39 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (090379) 846 |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) failed (130329, 837673, 841565, 856839) 846 |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-25 | House | CS by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 10 |
2020-02-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/25/20, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1164 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
S1220 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7067
S1400 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H1203 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S866 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7079 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H187 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H641 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1246 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1220 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7067
S1400 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H1203 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S866 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7079 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1498 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H187 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H641 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1246 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |