FL S1158 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2023-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2023-144)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising powers and duties of the department's Division of Investigative and Forensic Services; authorizing, rather than requiring, a judge of compensation claims to order an injured employee's evaluation by an expert medical advisor under certain circumstances; revising eligibility requirements for the board of directors of the Florida Self-Insurers Guaranty Association, Incorporated; deleting the authority of designated examination centers to take fingerprints of applicants for a license as an agent, customer representative, adjuster, service representative, or reinsurance intermediary; authorizing certain persons to obtain a limited license to sell only policies of life insurance covering the expense of a prearrangement for funeral services or merchandise; adding grounds for discretionary disciplinary actions taken by the department against a title insurance agent or agency; authorizing the department in receivership proceedings to take certain actions as a domiciliary receiver, etc.
Title
Department of Financial Services
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Nick DiCeglie [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 487 (Ch. 2023-144) |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 487 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time |
2023-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/12/23, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-28 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-22 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H487 (Similar To) 2023-05-26 - Chapter No. 2023-144
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 55952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
274 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 1265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 2815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7492 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 785 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 793 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 837 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 844 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 854 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 874 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9892 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 9957 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 745 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 398 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 716 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 816 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 1423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 419 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
634 | 423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 285 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 3875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |