FL S1158 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reserving to the state the exclusive right to regulate matters of commerce, trade, and labor under certain circumstances; prohibiting counties, municipalities, and special districts from engaging in specified actions that regulate commerce, trade, or labor, unless otherwise expressly authorized to do so by special or general law; providing that an ordinance, rule, or regulation that violates a specified provision is null and void, etc.
Title
Regulation of Commerce, Trade, and Labor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
189 | 0125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1158 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1158/BillText/Filed/HTML |