FL S1142 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the eligibility requirements for expunction of criminal history records to include instances in which a judgment of acquittal or a verdict of not guilty was rendered; clarifying the circumstances under which the Department of Law Enforcement must issue a certificate of eligibility for the sealing of a criminal history record, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expunction and Sealing of Criminal History Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-15SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-14SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-02-14SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-13SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-18SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S298 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1065
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-101

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430585Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943059Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback