FL S0298 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1065
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1065
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the elements that must be attested to by a petitioner in a statement submitted in support of the expunction of a criminal history record; revising the elements that must be attested to by a petitioner in a statement submitted in support of the sealing of a criminal history record; revising the circumstances under which the Department of Law Enforcement must issue a certificate of eligibility for sealing of a criminal history record, etc.
Title
Criminal History Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1065 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1065 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (471822) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-30 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-10-23 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 3 |
2017-10-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 10/23/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-09-29 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
943 | 0585 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |