FL S1142 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the terms "contract bundling" and "small business"; directing that agencies avoid contract bundling under certain circumstances; requiring agencies to conduct market research and include written summaries and analyses of such research in solicitations for bundled contracts; requiring agencies to award a specified percentage of contracts to small businesses; prohibiting agencies, general contractors, or prime contractors from requiring certain bonds or other sureties for certain contracts, etc.
Title
Small Business Participation in State Contracting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2013-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/21/13, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/14/13, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0985 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee