FL S1134 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises the requirements for a chiropractic medicine faculty certificate. Requires a person to register as a chiropractic assistant if he or she renders therapeutic services or administers therapeutic agents related to a chiropractic physician's treatment of a patient. Requires a fee for approval of a supervising chiropractic physician or group of chiropractic physicians, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chiropractic Medicine [SPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Health Regulation
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Judiciary; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00080
2010-01-20 Referred to Health Regulation; Judiciary; Health and Human Services Appropriations
2010-01-12 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0941 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
04604062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04604165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04604166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04604167Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback