FL S1130 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Gaming
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Gaming
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of the Lottery to create a program that authorizes a person to purchase a lottery ticket or game at a point-of-sale terminal; authorizing the department, a retailer operating from one or more locations, or a vendor approved by the department to use a point-of-sale terminal to sell lottery tickets or games; requiring a point-of-sale terminal to perform certain functions; prohibiting a point-of-sale terminal from dispensing money for winnings; authorizing winnings to be directly deposited into a player's account pursuant to a process approved by the department, etc.
Title
Point-of-sale Terminals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Gaming |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Gaming; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0547 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Select Committee on Gaming
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1130 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1130/BillText/Filed/HTML |