FL S1128 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the calculation of local government retirement benefits after a certain date. Requires the Department of Management Services to provide a fact sheet on each local plan. Deletes a limitation on the justification for approving an increase in member contributions. Provides a prohibition on the use of certain compensation for calculating retirement benefits. Directs the Department of Financial Services to develop a plan for rating the financial strength of local government defined benefit plans, etc.
Title
Public Retirement Plans
Sponsors
Senate Budget Committee | Sen. Anitere Flores [R] | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 851 | |
2011-05-04 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1119 | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1064 | |
2011-05-02 | In Messages | |
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time -SJ 651 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/11 -SJ 614 | |
2011-04-26 | CS/CS by Budget read 1st time -SJ 481 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-18 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-14 | CS/CS by- Budget; YEAS 17 NAYS 2 -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/14/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/13/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-03-22 | Now in Budget -SJ 236 | |
2011-03-21 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-17 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 10 NAYS 2 -SJ 236 | |
2011-03-14 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/11, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 84 | |
2011-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/24/11, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-02-21 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/22/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 84 | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0303 () 2011-01-27 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1128 (Ch.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 665 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
175 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
185 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |