FL S1122 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing district school boards and Florida College System institutions' boards of trustees, in consultation with certain organizations, to implement a plan for a differential out-of-state fee for specified purposes; requiring school districts and Florida College System institutions to prioritize the enrollment of certain students in specified programs of study, etc.
Title
Workforce Education Postsecondary Student Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Education (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-07 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2022-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/18/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H991 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1122
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1009 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |