FL S1110 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Jan 24 @ 3:00 pm in 37 Senate Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring grease waste haulers to dispose of grease waste at disposal facilities; prohibiting grease waste haulers from returning grease waste and graywater to certain grease interceptors and traps and from disposing of grease waste at locations other than disposal facilities; requiring haulers to document grease waste removal and disposal with service manifests; requiring inspecting entities to verify certain contracts and service manifests, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grease Waste Removal and Disposal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-05SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2021-12-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1177 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
403742Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback