FL S1110 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that state employees be automatically enrolled in the deferred compensation program by specified dates; requiring the Chief Financial Officer to notify state employees of automatic enrollment by a specified date; establishing contribution levels for participating state employees by specified dates; requiring a state agency to match employer contributions up to a specified amount, etc.
Title
Deferred Compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
2014-02-19 | Senate | SPB 7038 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1110) by Community Affairs |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1110 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1110/BillText/Filed/HTML |