FL S1108 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from intangible tax for lessees performing a governmental, municipal, or public purpose or function; providing for retroactive application; exempting certain items used to manufacture, produce, or modify aircraft engines and gas turbine engines and parts from the tax on sales, use, and other transactions; revising provisions relating to an exemption for machinery and equipment used to increase productive output; increasing the amount of income that is exempt from taxation etc.
Title
Taxation
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Senate Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7087 (Ch. | |
2012-02-27 | CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax read 1st time -SJ 686 | |
2012-02-27 | Now in Budget -SJ 685 | |
2012-02-23 | CS/CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 685 | |
2012-02-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 02/23/12, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-02-20 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax -SJ 534 | |
2012-02-16 | Now in Budget | |
2012-02-14 | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time -SJ 519 | |
2012-02-14 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-13 | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 518 | |
2012-02-08 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/13/12, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time -SJ 332 | |
2012-02-06 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 326 | |
2012-02-03 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-02 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 326 | |
2012-01-30 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/02/12, 3:15 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 89 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 89 | |
2011-12-01 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
196 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 63 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |