FL S1102 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the use of the surtax for the restoration or maintenance of natural water bodies for public use, etc.
Title
Local Government Infrastructure Surtax
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 04/09/14, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/19/14, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0987 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee