FL S1100 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the rights of children and young adults in out-of-home care; requiring the Florida Children's Ombudsman to serve as an autonomous entity within the department for certain purposes; requiring that a case plan be developed in a face-to-face conference with a caregiver of a child under certain circumstances; providing additional requirements for the licensure and operation of family foster homes, residential child-caring agencies, and child-placing agencies, etc.
Title
Child Welfare
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Ileana Garcia [R] | Sen. Victor Torres [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1093 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 96 (Ch. 2021-170)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 4085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 4088 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1753 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |