FL S1086 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting consideration during a specified period of the increased value from additions or improvements made to certain business property when assessing property taxes; providing an exemption from property taxation for machinery and equipment purchased by certain businesses for a specified period following purchase, etc.
Title
Property Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0847 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
193 | 1555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1086 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1086/BillText/Filed/HTML |