FL S1074 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1031
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exception from specified provisions for telemarketers and sellers who provide debt relief services under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Debt Relief Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1031 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1031 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-24 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-22 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2023-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1031 (Same As) 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-128