FL H1031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Chapter No. 2024-128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exception from specified provisions for telemarketers & sellers who provide debt relief services.
Title
Debt Relief Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#620 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#620 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Chapter No. 2024-128 | |
2024-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-05 | House | In Messages |
2024-03-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1074 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Received |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 119, NAYS 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024) |
2024-02-08 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Favorable by Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2024-01-29 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-01-26 | House | CS Filed |
2024-01-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-01-08 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1074 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1031