FL S1074 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating a conditional sentence for substance use and mental health offenders in accordance with s. 948.012, F.S.; authorizing a court to sentence an offender to a conditional sentence; authorizing the sentencing court to have the Department of Corrections provide a presentence investigation report in accordance with s. 921.231, F.S., to provide the court with certain information to determine the type of probation most appropriate for the offender; requiring an offender to comply with specified terms of drug offender or mental health probation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-04-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2019-03-21SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2019-03-20SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-03-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-18SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9480121Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback