FL S1070 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring an insurer, before issuing a personal lines residential property insurance policy, to offer a policy that provides a coverage limit on the dwelling equal to the unpaid principal balance of all mortgage loans on the risk; prohibiting a personal lines residential property insurer from requiring a coverage limit that includes the value of the land upon which the dwelling sits, etc.
Title
Personal Lines Residential Property Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H809 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1070 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1070/BillText/Filed/HTML |