FL S1070 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a county to use certain revenues from tourist development taxes to pay the debt service on bonds issued to finance the construction, reconstruction, or renovation of certain football stadiums and to pay planning and design costs incurred before the issuance of bonds. Creates an exemption from the tax on admissions for certain events sponsored by a governmental entity, sports authority, or sports commission.
Title
Sporting Events [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Finance and Tax | |
2010-04-16 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00599 | |
2010-04-15 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-14 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 -SJ 00599; CS read 1st time on 04/15/10 -SJ 00606 | |
2010-04-09 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/14/10, 9:30 am, 412-K | |
2010-04-08 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by Commerce; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-02 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00076 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Commerce; Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-01-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0579 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0125 | 0104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |