FL S1066 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting prohibitions against a dealer advertising or holding out to the public that he or she will absorb all or part of the sales and use tax or will relieve the purchaser of all or part of the tax; authorizing dealers, subject to specified conditions, to advertise or hold out to the public that they will absorb all or part of the tax or refund any part thereof to the purchaser, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Absorption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2019-03-20SenateNow in Finance and Tax
2019-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-18SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Rules
2019-02-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H979 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Referred to- Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21215Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback