FL H0979 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes prohibitions against dealer advertising or holding out to public that he or she will absorb all or part of sales & use tax or will relieve purchaser of all or part of tax; authorizes dealers, subject to specified conditions, to advertise or hold out to public that they will absorb all or part of tax or refund any part thereof to purchaser; revises criminal penalty; provides that certain persons who unlawfully fail to remit absorbed sales taxes are guilty of theft of state funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Absorption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#265 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-26SenateReceived
2019-04-26SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Rules
2019-04-26SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19
2019-04-18HouseReferred to- Calendar
2019-04-18HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Business and Professions Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-04-17HouseCS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time
2019-04-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-17HouseCS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 04/17/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Ways and Means Committee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1066 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21215Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback