FL S1040 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Miami-Dade Infectious Disease Elimination Act (IDEA)"; authorizing the University of Miami and its affiliates to establish a sterile needle and syringe exchange pilot program in Miami-Dade County; providing that the distribution of needles and syringes under the pilot program is not a violation of the Florida Comprehensive Drug Abuse Prevention and Control Act or any other law; requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability to submit a report and recommendations regarding the pilot program to the Legislature; providing for severability, etc.
Title
Infectious Disease Elimination Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/15 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/23/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0475 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1040 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1040/BillText/Filed/HTML |