FL H0475 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Miami-Dade Infectious Disease Elimination Act (IDEA)"; authorizes University of Miami & its affiliates to establish sterile needle and syringe exchange pilot program in Miami-Dade County; provides that distribution of needles & syringes under pilot program does not violate Florida Comprehensive Drug Abuse Prevention & Control Act; requires report by OPPAGA.
Title
Infectious Disease Elimination Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-03-04 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-03-04 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 9:00 am, 306 HOB |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1040 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/475 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0475/BillText/Filed/PDF |