FL S1040 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 870
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 870
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the eligibility requirements for taking the examinations required to practice dentistry if the applicant is a graduate of a certain dental college or school; revising the eligibility requirements for taking the examinations required to practice dental hygiene; revising the licensing requirements to practice as a dental hygienist; authorizing dental hygienists to administer certain local anesthesia under the direct supervision of a licensed dentist if certain educational requirements are met; requiring dental hygienists to maintain current certification in basic or advanced cardiopulmonary resuscitation or advanced cardiac life support with recertification every 2 years, etc.
Title
Practice of Dentistry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1070 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 870 | |
2012-03-05 | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 1083 | |
2012-03-05 | Substituted for CS/HB 1313 -HJ 1082 | |
2012-03-02 | Received -HJ 1061 | |
2012-03-02 | In Messages | |
2012-03-02 | Passed as amended; YEAS 33 NAYS 7 -SJ 773 | |
2012-03-02 | Read 3rd time -SJ 773 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-01 | Read 2nd time -SJ 734 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-16 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/21/12, 3:45 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 314 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 -SJ 314 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 02/01/12, 10:15 am, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-26 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations, 01/31/12, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled | |
2012-01-20 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2012-01-20 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 268 | |
2012-01-19 | Now in Budget -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 252 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 01/19/12, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 85 | |
2011-12-08 | Referred to Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 85 | |
2011-11-21 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
466 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |