FL S1024 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 741
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing certain entities to prohibit the installation of solar collectors under certain circumstances; revising and providing legislative findings relating to the redesign of net metering to avoid cross-subsidization of electric service costs between classes of ratepayers; providing the terms for public utility net metering programs after a specified date; providing conditions under which rulemaking must be initiated if the penetration rate of customer-owned or -leased renewable generation meets a specified threshold, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Energy Generation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-04SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 741
2022-03-04SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 741
2022-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2022-03-02SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2022-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
2022-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2022-03-01SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 4
2022-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2022-02-11SenateNow in Rules
2022-02-10SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2022-02-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2022-02-08SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 3
2022-02-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2022-01-18SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2022-01-13SenateNow in Community Affairs
2022-01-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2022-01-11SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/11/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-12-13SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
2021-11-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H741 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Vetoed by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36691Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/BillText/c3/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Amendment/611262/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Amendment/354274/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Amendment/493938/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Amendment/704420/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Amendment/634476/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Analyses/2022s01024.pre.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Analyses/2022s01024.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Analyses/2022s01024.pre.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Analyses/2022s01024.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Analyses/2022s01024.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Analyses/2022s01024.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Vote/2022-01-11%200400PM~S01024%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Vote/2022-02-08%200300PM~S01024%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1024/Vote/2022-03-01%200130PM~S01024%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback