FL H0741 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Veto Message received (2022D Special Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides terms for public utility net metering programs after specified date; provides schedule of reductions to net metering rate designs that apply to customers with net metering applications that are approved after specified dates; authorizes certain customers who own or lease renewable generation to remain under net metering rules that initially applied to those customers for specified time; authorizes public utilities to petition for approval of certain fixed charges designed to meet specified purposes; provides conditions under which rules must be initiated if penetration rate of customer-owned or leased renewable generation meets specified threshold; authorizes public utilities to recover specified lost revenues upon meeting certain requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Net Metering

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#655 (Y: 83 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24HouseVeto Message received (2022D Special Session)
2022-04-27 Vetoed by Governor
2022-04-27 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2022-03-07HouseOrdered enrolled
2022-03-07HouseIn Messages
2022-03-07SenateCS passed; YEAS 24 NAYS 15
2022-03-07SenateAmendment(s) failed (487084)
2022-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2022-03-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2022-03-04SenateAmendment(s) failed (541830, 967140, 972756)
2022-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2022-03-04SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1024
2022-03-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-03-04SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2022-03-02SenateReceived
2022-03-02SenateReferred to Rules
2022-03-02SenateIn Messages
2022-03-02HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 83, NAYS 31
2022-03-02HouseRead 3rd time
2022-03-01HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2022-03-01HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2022-03-01HouseAmendment 932703 ruled out of order
2022-03-01HouseAmendment 214887 Failed
2022-03-01HouseAmendment 395669 ruled out of order
2022-03-01HouseAmendment 923115 Failed
2022-03-01HouseAmendment 281527 Failed
2022-03-01HouseAmendment 733787 adopted
2022-03-01HouseAmendment 490195 Failed
2022-03-01HouseAmendment 297461 Failed
2022-03-01HouseAmendment 812213 Failed
2022-03-01HouseRead 2nd time
2022-02-24House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2022-02-24HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
2022-02-24HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2022-02-24HouseCS Filed
2022-02-24HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-02-24HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2022-02-23HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2022-02-21HousePCS added to Commerce Committee agenda
2022-02-21HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2022-02-21HouseReported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-02-21HouseFavorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-02-17HouseAdded to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
2022-02-07HouseNow in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-02-07HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-02-07HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-02-04House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-02-04HouseCS Filed
2022-02-04HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2022-02-03HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-02-03HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-02-01HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-13HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-11-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1024 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 741

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36691Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/588063/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/812213/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/297461/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/177723/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/733787/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/621333/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/923115/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/395669/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/490195/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/281527/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/214887/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/068895/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Amendment/932703/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Analyses/h0741.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Analyses/h0741a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Analyses/h0741b.SAT.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Analyses/h0741c.SAT.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Analyses/h0741d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Analyses/h0741z.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Analyses/h0741z1.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=64371&IsPCB=0&BillId=75044
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=65407&IsPCB=0&BillId=75044
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=65603&IsPCB=1&BillId=75044
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Vote/HouseVote_h00741e1655.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/741/Vote/SenateVote_h00741e1004.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback