FL S1020 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 667
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 667
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Including an electronic order as a type of order construed as a sale made at a vendor's licensed place of business; authorizing a vendor to make certain deliveries in a third-party vehicle under certain circumstances; providing that the vehicles used to make such deliveries are subject to certain inspections and searches under certain circumstances; requiring that the recipient's identity and age be verified and documented at the time of delivery, etc.
Title
Alcohol Deliveries
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Senate Regulated Industries Committee | Sen. Dana Young [R] |
Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 667 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 667 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2018-01-11 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H667 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-133