FL S1020 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the membership of students that a school district reports for transportation funding purposes; revising the school transportation allocation formula used by each school district; revising the types of students eligible for transportation funds used for transportation to and from school in private passenger cars and boats, etc.
Title
Student Transportation Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/18/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1020 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1020/BillText/Filed/HTML |