FL S1016 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program Act"; creating the Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program within the Department of Law Enforcement; requiring the department to contract with a corporation not for profit to administer and manage the program; providing requirements for the disbursement of funds for the veterinary care of eligible retired law enforcement dogs; placing an annual cap on the amount of funds available for the care of an eligible retired law enforcement dog, etc.
Title
Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Messages |
2015-04-28 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/16/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/23/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0711 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee