FL H0711 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act "Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program Act"; creates Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program within FDLE; requires FDLE to contract with nonprofit corporation to administer & manage program; provides requirements for corporation; provides requirements for disbursement of funds for veterinary care of eligible retired law enforcement dogs; places annual cap on funds available for eligible retired law enforcement dog; prohibits former handler or adopter from seeking reimbursement if funds are depleted for year such reimbursement is sought; provides for deposit of program funds; provides for reversion of funds to FDLE; authorizes carryforward of unexpended appropriations for use in program up to certain limits; requires FDLE to adopt rules; provides appropriation.
Title
Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-12 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-12 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1016 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/711 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0711/BillText/Filed/PDF |