FL S1002 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 505 (Ch. 2017-110), CS/HB 477 (Ch. 2017-107)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a reference to ch. 893, F.S., or to any section or portion thereof, includes all subsequent amendments; specifying that ioflupane (123I) is not included in Schedule II of the standards and schedules of controlled substances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Comprehensive Drug Abuse Prevention and Control Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 505 (Ch. 2017-110), CS/HB 477 (Ch. 2017-107)
2017-05-01SenateSubstituted CS/HB 505
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/17
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-25SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2017-04-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/25/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-04-04SenateNow in Rules
2017-04-04SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/04/17, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-03-29SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2017-03-29SenateNow in Judiciary
2017-03-29SenateRemaining references corrected to Judiciary; Rules
2017-03-29SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Appropriations
2017-03-28SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-03-27SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2017-03-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-02-23SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2017-02-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0505 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-110, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 477 (Ch. 2017-107)
H477 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-107, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 505 (Ch. 2017-110)
S150 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 477 (Ch. 2017-107), CS/HB 505 (Ch. 2017-110)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
893015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback