FL H0477 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-107, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 505 (Ch. 2017-110)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that certain crime laboratory personnel may possess, store, & administer emergency opioid antagonists; provides that unlawful distribution of specified controlled substances & analogs or mixtures thereof which proximately cause death is murder; adds certain synthetic opioid substitute compounds to Schedule I; prohibits possession of more than 10 grams of specified substances; revises substances that constitute certain trafficking offenses; creates certain trafficking offenses; provides specified minimum terms of imprisonment & fines based on quantity involved in for certain offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#160 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Chapter No. 2017-107, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 505 (Ch. 2017-110)
2017-06-14 Approved by Governor
2017-05-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2017-05-05HouseOrdered enrolled
2017-05-05SenateCS passed; YEAS 31 NAYS 7
2017-05-05SenateReceded from 1 amendment(s) (285990)
2017-05-04SenateIn returning messages
2017-05-04HouseRefused to concur, requested Senate to recede 1113
2017-05-03HouseIn returning messages
2017-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2017-05-03SenateRead 3rd time 723
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-05-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (285990)
2017-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 150
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2017-04-25SenateReceived
2017-04-25SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2017-04-25SenateIn Messages
2017-04-20HouseCS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-19HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-19HouseRead 2nd time 730
2017-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17
2017-04-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17
2017-04-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-04-06HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-04-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-04-03HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2017-04-03HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2017-03-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/03/17, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-03-20HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-03-16HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-16HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-15HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1
2017-03-13HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-06HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-01-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0150 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 477 (Ch. 2017-107), CS/HB 505 (Ch. 2017-110)
H505 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-110, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 477 (Ch. 2017-107)
S1002 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 505 (Ch. 2017-110), CS/HB 477 (Ch. 2017-107)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012467Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316193Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3222616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381887Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4590137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63089Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7750823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78207Amended CodeSee Bill Text
78706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
817563Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
856015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8930356Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
948062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback