FL S0996 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting allopathic, osteopathic, and chiropractic physicians who sell or rent electrostimulation medical equipment and supplies to their patients in the course of their practice from licensure as home medical equipment providers, etc.
Title
Home Medical Equipment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted HB 1305 (Vetoed by Governor) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/15 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1305 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/996 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0996/BillText/Filed/HTML |