FL H1305 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts allopathic, osteopathic, & chiropractic physicians who sell or rent electrostimulation medical equipment from licensure requirements under certain circumstances.
Title
Home Medical Equipment Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#195 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#195 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | House | Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A) |
2015-06-10 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-05-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-23 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for SB 996 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-22 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/01/15, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-03-18 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 03/18/15, 9:00 am, 306 HOB |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0996 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table