FL S0988 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a driver from using a cellular telephone or other wireless communications device in a school zone, in a school crossing, or on school district property; providing exceptions; providing penalties, etc.
Title
Driving Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation; Education |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Transportation; Education |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0645 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/988 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0988/BillText/Filed/HTML |