FL S0984 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Chapter No. 2024-233
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Chapter No. 2024-233
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a judgment lien to be acquired on specified personal property and in all payment intangibles and accounts of a judgment debtor whose location is in this state; specifying that the rights of certain judgment creditors to proceed against a judgment debtor's property are subject to certain provisions; prohibiting security interests and liens on payment intangibles or accounts and the proceeds thereof from taking priority over payment intangibles or accounts by a judgment lien certificate filed before a specified date, etc.
Title
Judgment Liens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#918 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Chapter No. 2024-233 | |
2024-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2024-02-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-17 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H175 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |