FL S0980 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 845 (Ch. 2019-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 845 (Ch. 2019-39)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for any information that can be used to identify a petitioner or respondent in a petition for certain protective injunctions, and any related affidavit, notice of hearing, and temporary injunction, until the respondent has been personally served; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Petition for Certain Protective Injunctions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 845 (Ch. 2019-39) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 845 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/10/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-19 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H845 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-39