FL S0966 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a person who provides or offers to provide massage services to possess a license and certain identifying documents and requires such person to present a license and an identifying document to a law enforcement officer upon request. Requires any person who operates a massage establishment to maintain certain valid work authorization documents on the premises for certain employees, etc.
Title
Massage Services [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) | |
2010-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 110-S --Not received | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00537 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-26 | Original reference(s) removed: Regulated Industries; Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 00368 | |
2010-03-19 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-18 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00279; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00284 | |
2010-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/18/10, 1:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Regulated Industries; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00069 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Health Regulation; Criminal Justice; Regulated Industries; Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2009-12-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0633 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0477 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0480 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0480 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0480 | 0415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0480 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0480 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0480 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0480 | 054 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0501 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0509 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0787 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |