FL S0952 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring licensed nursing home facilities to report to the Agency for Health Care Administration any common ownership relationships they or their parent companies share with certain entities; requiring the agency to work with stakeholders to determine how to present such information on an easily accessible online dashboard; requiring the agency to submit annual reports on the success of the personal care attendant program to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Health Care Transparency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H891 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/952 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/952/BillText/Filed/HTML |