FL S0950 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 697 (Ch. 2015-120)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 697 (Ch. 2015-120)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain state and local officers to assist in enforcing rules and orders issued by the Department of Health under ch. 381, F.S.; authorizing the State Health Officer to issue orders to isolate individuals; specifying that any order the department issues is immediately enforceable by a law enforcement officer; providing a penalty for violating an isolation order, etc.
Title
Public Health Emergencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 697 (Ch. 2015-120) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 697 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/15 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/15/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/08/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0697 (Similar To) 2015-06-11 - Chapter No. 2015-120
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 0012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 00315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |