FL S0948 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-177
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a legislative declaration that efforts to adequately and dependably meet water needs require the cooperation of utility companies, private landowners, water consumers, and the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; providing that the governing board of a water management district shall assist self-suppliers, among others, in meeting water supply demands in a manner that will give priority to encouraging conservation and reducing adverse environmental effects, etc.
Title
Water Supply
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#384 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#67 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#67 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Chapter No. 2013-177 | |
2013-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-05-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2013-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Received |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/13 |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-04-03 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | CS by- Agriculture; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 04/01/13, 12:15 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/18/13, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Now in Agriculture |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/07/13, 10:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Agriculture |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1063 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 948 (Ch. 2013-177)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |