FL H1063 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 948 (Ch. 2013-177)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises legislative intent with regard to water supply policy, planning, production, & funding; requires water management districts to assist private landowners & self-suppliers in meeting certain water supply needs & to coordinate with private landowners & DACS for regional water supply planning; authorizes water management districts to contract with such entities for specified purposes; clarifies funding assistance eligibility criteria for certain water supply development projects; provides criteria & requirements for determining agricultural water supply demand projections; requires DACS to establish agricultural water supply planning program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Supply

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 948 (Ch. 2013-177)
2013-03-25HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2013-03-22HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-03-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-03-20HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2013-03-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/20/13, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall
2013-03-06HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0948 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-177

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
373701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
570085Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback