FL S0940 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HM 147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HM 147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to apply law and policy in Puerto Rico without discrimination or inequality and to incorporate the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico into the United States, etc.
Title
Puerto Rico
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HM 147 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/HM 147 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Rules |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H147 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/940 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/940/BillText/Filed/HTML |