FL H0147 | 2018 | Regular Session


Status: Enrolled on March 8 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]


Urges Congress to apply law & policy in Puerto Rico without discrimination or inequality & to incorporate Commonwealth of Puerto Rico into United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Status of Puerto Rico



2018-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-08SenateCS adopted
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for SM 940
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary; Rules
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2018-01-24SenateIn Messages
2018-01-24HouseCS adopted
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time 399
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-11HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-11HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 01/11/18, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2017-11-09HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2017-11-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-11-08HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-11-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 8:00 am, 12 HOB
2017-09-19HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee

Same As/Similar To

S940 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HM 147

Florida State Sources

Bill Comments