FL S0930 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying and location information of current and former judicial assistants and their spouses and children; providing for retroactive application of the exemption; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Identifying and Location Information/Judicial Assistants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H679 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/930 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/930/BillText/Filed/HTML |