FL S0920 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the maximum face amount of checks that may be taken for deferred presentment installment transactions, exclusive of fees; specifying the maximum rate and frequency of fees that deferred presentment providers or their affiliates may charge on deferred presentment installment transactions; authorizing providers of deferred presentment installment transactions to accept additional checks subject to certain limitations, etc.
Title
Deferred Presentment Transactions
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Commerce and Tourism Committee | Sen. Rob Bradley [R] |
Sen. Oscar Braynon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#871 (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Chapter No. 2018-26 | |
2018-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-07 | House | CS passed; YEAS 106 NAYS 9 |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time 1056 |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 857 |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-05 | House | Received |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2018-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2018-03-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 31 NAYS 5 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (864952) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules |
2018-01-31 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 2 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H857 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/SB 920
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
559 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
560 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |