FL S0914 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain entities from engaging in digital trust business without an application to and prior approval by the Office of Financial Regulation; authorizing a state bank or state trust company to exclusively engage in virtual trust business under certain circumstances; requiring the commission to ensure that the state bank's or state trust company's policies and procedures satisfy certain requirements; requiring the commission to establish standards by rule which relate to stablecoin, etc.
Title
Digital Trust Business
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/914 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/914/BillText/Filed/HTML |