FL S0914 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating an exemption from public records requirements for medical and personal identifying information of an applicant for or a recipient of the property tax exemption for totally and permanently disabled persons; providing for retroactive application; authorizing disclosure of such information under certain conditions; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Identifying Medical and Personal Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Messages |
2016-02-24 | House | In Messages |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/18/16 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 1 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/10/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/01/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0901 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee